MS SR57 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Immediate Release
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Resolution Mourning The Passing Of Emma Sanders, Lifelong Member Of The Democratic Party State Executive Committee, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Senate To Her Surviving Family.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mourn passing of Emma Sanders, life member of the Democratic Party State Executive Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateImmediate Release
2020-06-30SenateAdopted
2020-06-29SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2020-06-26SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback