MS SR36 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Giving Thanks To Moss Point Pastor Derrick Tapper, First Baptist Church (sbc), And Moss Point Pastor Kevin Henry, First Missionary Baptist Church, And Their Respective Congregations, Who United And Held Services In A Common Sanctury Following The Devastating Tornado Damage On June 19, 2023, For Their Commitment To Community.
Title
Commend First Baptist Church (SBC) and First Missionary Baptist Church in Moss Point for combined services following tornado.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Rules |