MS SC638 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Bay Springs High School "bulldogs" Boys Basketball Team And Head Coach Corey Mackey For Winning Its Second Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 2a State Title In Five Years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commend Bay Springs High School "Bulldogs" Boys Basketball Team for winning the Championship 2A State Title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-26SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-20HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-20HouseAdopted
2019-03-19HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-18HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-14SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-14SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-14SenateAdopted
2019-03-13SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-13SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback