MS SC559 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Offering The Sincerest Congratulations Of The Legislature To Ricky Stenhouse, Jr., From Olive Branch, Mississippi, For Winning The 2023 Daytona 500 After A Record 212 Laps.
Title
Congratulate Ricky Stenhouse from Olive Branch for winning the Daytona 500.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-03-14 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Rules |