MS SB3215 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Lafayette County, Mississippi, To Provide Funding To The Oxford-lafayette Economic Development Foundation, In An Amount Not To Exceed $250,000.00 In Any Fiscal Year, For Economic Development Projects In The County And For Administrative Needs Of The Foundation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Lafayette County; authorize to provide funding to Oxford-Lafayette County Economic Development Foundation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-30 | House | Passed |
2024-04-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-19 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |