MS SB3202 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Issaquena County, Mississippi, To Transfer To The Town Of Mayersville, Mississippi, A Certain Lot Which The County Has No Use For; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Issaquena County; authorize transfer of lot to Town of Mayersville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-03-27 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-27 | Passed | |
2010-03-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-27 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-25 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-25 | Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-22 | Referred To Local and Private |