MS SB3200 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Issaquena County, Mississippi, To Participate In A Project To Install Turbines In The Mississippi River To Generate Electricity For Sale By The County; To Provide That The County May Finance The Project By Issuance Of Revenue Bonds; To Authorize Issaquena County To Form A Nonprofit Corporation To Carry Out The Project; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Issaquena County; authorize to participate in turbine project in Mississippi River.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Died In Committee | |
2010-03-27 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means | |
2010-03-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-26 | Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-03-24 | DR - TSDPCS: LP To FI | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |