MS SB3120 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying Certain Infrastructure Expenses Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation, For The Fiscal Year 2024; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Capital Expense Fund; FY2024 appropriation to MDOT for certain infrastructure expenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Nicole Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 61 | |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-26 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-26 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-17 | House | Conferees Named Read,Busby,Arnold |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Branning,DeBar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-09 | House | Amended |
2023-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |