MS SB3088 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 879, Local And Private Laws Of 1992, As Last Amended By Chapter 958, Local And Private Laws Of 2007, To Extend Until July 1, 2015, The Repeal Date On The Provisions Of Law Which Establish The Grenada Tourism Commission And Authorize The Imposition Of A Tourist And Convention Tax; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Grenada; extend the repeal date on the Grenada Tourism Commission and the Grenada tourist and convention tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Passed | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-26 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2011-03-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-26 | Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-14 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |