MS SB3083 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred To Judiciary B
Pending: House Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred To Judiciary B
Pending: House Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Larry Sills Of Newton County, Mississippi.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Larry Sills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |