MS SB3074 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact And Amend Chapter 1005, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Last Amended By Chapter 912, Local And Private Laws Of 2014, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Provision Of Law Authorizing The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Pascagoula, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Derived From Hotel, Motel And Bed-and-breakfast Room Rentals In The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Pascagoula; reenact the hotel, motel and bed-and-breakfast tax, and extend the repeal date to July 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |