MS SB3054 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Clarke County, Mississippi, To Donate Funds To Multi-county Community Service Agency, Inc.; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Clarke County; authorize donations to Multi-County Community Service Agency, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |