MS SB3022 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Conferees Named Oliver,Read,Massengill
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Conferees Named Oliver,Read,Massengill
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Office Of State Aid Road Construction Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation For Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Transportation, Department of - State Aid Road Construction, Office of.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Reginald Jackson [D] |
Sen. Mike Thompson [R] | Sen. Bart Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Oliver,Read,Massengill |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Branning,Williams |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | House | Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To A4 |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: A4 To AP |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations E;Appropriations A |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |