MS SB2957 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 816, Local And Private Laws Of 1991, As Last Amended By Chapter 944, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Provision Of Law That Establishes The Washington County Convention And Visitors Committee And Authorizes A Tax On Hotels, Motels And Restaurants; To Require An Election On The Continuation Of The Tax If A Certain Number Of Electors File A Written Protest Against The Continuation Of The Tax; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Washington County; extend the repeal date on the Washington County Convention and Visitors Committee and the tourism tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed |
2014-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |