MS SB2927 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Office Of State Aid Road Construction Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation For Fiscal Year 2022.
Title
Appropriation; Transportation, Department of - State Aid Road Construction, Office of.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] |
Sen. Rita Potts Parks [R] | Sen. Tammy Witherspoon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Busby,Eubanks |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Branning,Witherspoon |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |