MS SB2926 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Vicksburg, Mississippi, To Levy An Additional Sales Tax Of Not More Than 2% On The Gross Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For Recreation And Tourism Facilities; To Authorize Such Governing Authorities To Issue Bonds For A Term Not To Exceed 20 Years For The Purpose Of Purchasing Property, Constructing Or Leasing A Sports Complex And To Authorize The Governing Authorities To Lease City-owned Property For A Term Not To Exceed 20 Years For A Nominal Fee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Vicksburg; authorize a tax on hotels, motels and restaurants for recreation and tourism venues and facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-29 | House | Passed |
2015-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |