MS SB2856 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-541, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make It Clear That Curbside Voting For Physically Disabled Voters May Only Be Utilized On The Day Of The Election; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Curbside voting; make it clear that it is authorized only on the day of the election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Apportionment and Elections | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Elections |