MS SB2827 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Portion Of U.s. Highway 11 In Lamar County As The "tyler Kilsby And Leon Sims Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highways; designate certain segment of U.S. Highway 11 in Lamar County as "Tyler Kilsby and Leon Sims Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Referred To Transportation | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Highways and Transportation |