MS SB2814 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Water Quality Commission For The Purpose Of Providing Oversight To Local Governments And Nonprofit Entities In Order To Create Or Maintain Efficient, Safe, And Reliable Water And Sewer Systems For Citizens; To Provide For The Membership Of The Commission; To Require Any Local Government Or Nonprofit Entity Which Violates The Maximum Contaminant Level Under The Safe Drinking Water Act To Provide The Commission A Copy Of All Documents Relating To Such Violations; To Authorize The Commission To Promulgate Rules And Regulations Necessary To Effectuate The Purpose Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Water Quality Commission; create for the purpose of providing oversight of certain water and sewer systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |