MS SB2814 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 51-9-176, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Pearl River Valley Water District Reservoir Police To Participate In Multijurisdictional Training, Law Enforcement And Emergency Operations; To Change The Name Of The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District Reservoir Patrol To Pearl River Valley Water Supply District Reservoir Police; To Amend Sections 51-9-171, 51-9-175, 51-9-177, 51-9-179, 51-9-181 And 51-9-183, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pearl River Valley Water Supply District Reservoir Police; authorize to participate in multijurisdictional operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2012-04-09 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-05 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-05 | Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-29 | DR - TSDP: JB To CR | |
2012-03-22 | DR - TSDP: CR To JB | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources;Judiciary B | |
2012-03-14 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-13 | Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Environment Prot, Cons and Water Res |