MS SB2799 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-69-3, 27-69-5, 27-69-13, 27-69-27 And 27-69-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "alternative Nicotine Product" And Include Such Products Within The Regulatory Provisions Of The Tobacco Tax Law; To Levy A Tax On Alternative Nicotine Products; To Amend Section 97-32-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalties For The Sale Of Alternative Nicotine Products Or Any Cartridge Or Component Of A Nicotine Product To Individuals Under The Age Of 18; To Penalize Persons Under The Age Of 18 Who Present False Identification For The Purpose Of Purchasing Alternative Nicotine Products Or Any Cartridge Or Component Of An Alternative Nicotine Product; To Authorize Law Enforcement Officers To Use Persons Under The Age Of 18 To Purchase Or Attempt To Purchase Alternative Nicotine Products For The Purpose Of Monitoring Compliance; To Require Law Enforcement Agencies Conducting Enforcement Efforts To Make Certain Reports; To Require The Department Of Revenue To Be Notified Of Violations; To Require The Department Of Revenue To Initiate Procedures To Revoke Retailers Permits For Certain Violations; To Create New Sections 97-32-53, 97-32-55, 97-32-57, 97-32-59 And 97-32-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Purchase Of Alternative Nicotine Products And Their Components By Persons Under The Age Of 18 And To Prohibit The Possession Of Alternative Nicotine Products Or Their Components By Students At Any High School, Junior High School, Middle School Or Elementary School; To Require Employers To Inform Employees Regarding The Prohibition On The Sale Of Alternative Nicotine Products And Their Components To Persons Under The Age Of 18 And To Require Employees To Sign A Form To That Effect; To Provide That Employers Who Instruct Their Employees As Provided In This Act Shall Not Be Liable For Violations Committed By Their Employees Absent Proof That The Employer Was In Some Way Complicit In The Unlawful Sale; To Require Certain Warning Signs To Be Posted At Each Point Of Sale Of Alternative Nicotine Products; To Provide That Retailers Shall Not Distribute Alternative Nicotine Products Or Their Components Other Than In A Sealed Package Provided By The Manufacturer With The Required Health Warning; To Require Random, Unannounced Inspections At Locations Where Alternative Nicotine Products Are Sold To Ensure Compliance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alternative nicotine products; impose a tax upon and regulate under the Tobacco Tax Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Failed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-03-03 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: FI To PH |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PH To FI |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Finance |