MS SB2774 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Codify Sections 37-28-1, 37-28-3, 37-28-5, 37-28-7, 37-28-9, 37-28-11, 37-28-13, 37-28-15, 37-28-17, 37-28-19 And 37-28-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Authorization For Conversion Charter Schools Under Which Existing Public Schools Meeting Certain Criteria May Convert To Charter School Status, To Provide Authorization For New Open-enrollment Public Charter Schools In The State Of Mississippi, To Provide That Such Open-enrollment Public Charter Schools Shall Be Organized As Nonprofit Tax-exempt Organizations, To Provide Criteria For Academic Achievements At The Public Charter Schools, To Provide That Certain State Funds Shall Go Directly To The Newly Established Public Charter Schools On A Per-pupil Expenditure Basis, To Provide That Such Public Charter Schools May Use A Weighted Lottery System To Fill Enrollment Seats, To Provide For The Governance Of Such Public Charter Schools And To Provide That Teachers Shall Be Employees Of The Public Charter Schools, To Provide That The State Board Of Education Shall Issue Regulations, And To Provide For Reporting, To Provide For Transportation Of Students Attending Public Charter Schools, And To Provide For Probation And Revocation Of Public Charter Schools By The State Superintendent Of Education; To Repeal Sections 37-28-1 Through 37-28-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Effective July 1, 2020; To Repeal Sections 37-165-1 Through 37-165-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The "conversion Charter School Act Of 2010"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Charter schools; authorize open-enrollment and conversion public charter schools in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Education | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Education |