MS SB2764 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Section In Title 63, Chapter 21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Issuance By The Department Of Revenue, Through The County Tax Collectors, Of Special Decals To Be Placed On The License Plates And Front Left Windshield Corners Of Vehicles Of Applicants With Health Conditions Or Disabilities Limiting Or Impairing Effective Communication With Law Enforcement; To Require That The Initial Application And The Application For Renewal Be Accompanied By The Certification Of A Mississippi Licensed Physician Or Psychologist Indicating That The Applicant, Or The Applicant's Child, Parent Or Spouse, Has A Physical Or Mental Health Condition Impairing The Ability To Effectively Communicate With Law Enforcement, And That The Physician Or Psychologist Has Determined That The Communication Impairment Will Last For At Least Five Years; To Provide For The Confidentiality Of The Information Supplied By The Applicant To The Department Of Revenue Or To The County Tax Collector; To Create A New Section In Title 45, Chapter 6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Direct The Board On Law Enforcement Officer Standards And Training To Promulgate Regulations Requiring Education And Training Components On Mental Health And Behavioral Issues To Assist Law Enforcement Officers In Recognizing Health Conditions Or Disabilities That May Impede Effective Communication; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; allow registrant to indicate condition impeding effective communication for law enforcement notification.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Boyd [R] | Sen. Michael McLendon [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] | Sen. Neil Whaley [R] |
Sen. Kathy Chism [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-23 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Massengill,Hudson |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Parks,Boyd |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: WM To TR |
2020-06-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: TR To WM |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred To Transportation;Ways and Means |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: HI To FI |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Finance |