MS SB2761 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Section 9-1-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is A Provision Related To Judicial Support Staff, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Judicial support staff; bring forward provision related to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To Judiciary A;Appropriations A |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: JA To AP |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Appropriations |