MS SB2731 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Due From Governor 05/25/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Due From Governor 05/25/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-7-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Who The Commissioner Of Corrections May Place On Conditional Medical Release; To Authorize The Commissioner To Place Bedridden Offenders On Such Release; To Clarify That If An Offender Is No Longer Eligible For Conditional Medical Release Then Such Offender Shall Be Returned To The Actual Custody Of The Department Of Corrections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bedridden nonviolent state offenders; authorize Commissioner of Corrections to place on conditional medical release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Due From Governor 05/25/12 | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-27 | Conferees Named DeBar,Whittington,Weathersby | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Jackson (32nd),Tindell,Simmons (12th) | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-11 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-10 | Amended | |
2012-03-26 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Corrections | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Corrections |