MS SB2681 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Enact The Mississippi Religious Freedom Restoration Act; To Provide That State Action Shall Not Substantially Burden A Person's Right To The Exercise Of Religion; To Prescribe The Contents Of The Great Seal Of The State Of Mississippi; To Provide That State Agencies Shall Continue To Use Stationery And Other Supplies Having The Great Seal As It Existed As Of July 1, 2014, Until Supplies Of Such Items Are Depleted; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Religious Freedom Restoration Act; enact and modify the great seal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 79 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 82 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03 Approved by Governor
2014-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-04-01SenateConference Report Adopted
2014-04-01HouseConference Report Adopted
2014-03-31HouseConference Report Filed
2014-03-31SenateConference Report Filed
2014-03-27HouseConferees Named Gipson,Hood,Monsour
2014-03-27SenateConferees Named Polk,Gandy,Fillingane
2014-03-27SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2014-03-18HouseReturned For Concurrence
2014-03-12HousePassed As Amended
2014-03-12HouseAmended
2014-03-11HouseRead the Third Time
2014-03-04HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2014-02-15HouseReferred To Judiciary B
2014-02-04SenateTransmitted To House
2014-01-31SenatePassed As Amended
2014-01-31SenateAmended
2014-01-30SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-01-29SenateDR - TSDP: UC To JA
2014-01-20SenateReferred To Universities and Colleges;Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback