MS SB2669 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-15-205, 27-15-223, 83-5-71 And 83-17-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make The Term Of Certain Licenses And Certificates Issued By The Commissioner Of Insurance Perpetual Until Such Time As The Commissioner Of Insurance Revokes The License Or Certificate, Or The License Or Certificate Is Forfeited By The Licensee Or Certificate Holder; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance company licenses; perpetual until revoked or forfeited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Zuber,Ford (54th),Yancey |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,Thomas,Kirby |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 15 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 15 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 17 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |