MS SB2669 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-1-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Authority Of The Mississippi Development Authority To Use Certain Funds From The Local Governments Capital Improvements Revolving Loan Fund For Ordinary And Necessary General Support Of The Agency; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Local Governments Capital Improvements Revolving Loan Fund; extend repeal date on MDA's authority to use for certain expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Vetoed | |
2019-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |