MS SB2664 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-30, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If A Nonresident's Domicile State Has Mandatory Licensing Requirements Then The Nonresident Must Meet Those Requirements Before Receiving A Mississippi Nonresident Commercial Fishing License; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Marine Resources; require a nonresident to meet licensing requirements before receiving a Mississippi commercial fishing license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |