MS SB2663 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 936, Local And Private Laws Of 2016, As Amended By Chapter 911, Local And Private Laws Of 2018, To Extend Until July 1, 2028, The Repeal Date On The Law That Authorizes The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Carthage, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For Recreation And Tourism Facilities; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Carthage; extend repeal date on hotel, motel and restaurant tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2024-04-18 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-17 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-17 | House | Amended |
2024-04-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |