MS SB2658 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-13-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision That Required The Division Of Medicaid's Rates Of Reimbursement, Services, Charges And Fees To Not Be Increased, Decreased Or Otherwise Changed Unless They Are Authorized By An Amendment By The Legislature; To Require The Division To Report To The Chairmen Of The Senate And House Of Representatives Medicaid Committees At Least Thirty (30) Days Before The Division Notifies Providers That It Is Decreasing Or Changing Payments, Payment Methodology Or Rates Or Reimbursement To Providers Rendering Care Of Services Authorized Under This Section To Recipients; To Set Requirements For The Reimbursement Of Durable Medical Equipment, Including Noninvasive Ventilators Or Ventilation Treatments Properly Ordered And Being Used In An Appropriate Care Setting; To Require Reimbursement To Durable Medical Equipment Suppliers For Home Use Of Noninvasive And Invasive Ventilators To Be On A Continuous Monthly Payment Basis For The Duration Of Medical Need Throughout A Patient's Valid Prescription Period; To Require The Division Of Medicaid To Establish A Medicare Upper Payment Limits Program Or Another Allowable Delivery System Authorized By Federal Law For Emergency Ambulance Transportation Providers; To Provide For The Formula That The Division Shall Use For Calculating Ambulance Service Access Payment Amounts; To Require The Division To Evaluate The Feasibility Of Using A Single Vendor To Administer Dental Benefits Provided Under A Managed Care Delivery System; To Provide That The Division Of Medicaid Shall Reimburse For Outpatient Hospital Services Provided To Eligible Medicaid Beneficiaries Under The Age Of 21 By Border City University-affiliated Pediatric Teaching Hospitals; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Medicaid Program; make technical amendments to reimbursement and administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Medicaid |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Medicaid |