MS SB2647 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The National Instant Criminal Background Check System Improvement Act; To Facilitate Reporting To The Federal Bureau Of Investigation Certain Information Solely For The Purpose Of Inclusion In The National Instant Criminal Background Check System Database; To Enact Definitions; To Impose Duties On Circuit And Chancery Clerks; To Impose Duties On Circuit And Chancery Courts; To Amend Section 97-37-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Rehabilitation From The Disability Of Being Able To Purchase A Firearm Under Federal Law; To Amend Section 41-21-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
NICS Improvement Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baker, Reynolds) |
2013-03-07 | House | Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |