MS SB2624 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Due From Governor 04/22/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-35-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Real Estate Commission To Establish A Pilot Program Allowing Administrative Hearings On Certain Licensing Matters Under Its Jurisdiction; To Provide That Administrative Hearing Officers Shall Be Staff Attorneys Employed By The Attorney General; To Amend Section 73-35-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Appeal Take A Defendant From An Adverse Ruling Or Order Of The Mississippi Real Estate Commission Shall Act As A Supersedeas; To Amend Section 73-35-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MS Real Estate Commission; require to establish pilot program using administrative hearing officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05 Due From Governor 04/22/21
2021-04-01HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-04-01SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-29HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-28HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-28SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-22HouseConferees Named Cockerham,Lamar,Watson
2021-03-16SenateConferees Named Caughman,Sparks,McMahan
2021-03-15SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-10HouseReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-09HousePassed As Amended
2021-03-09HouseAmended
2021-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2021-02-12SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-11SenatePassed
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-02-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Business and Financial Institutions

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
733521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
733523Amended CodeSee Bill Text
733525Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/SB/SB2624.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2624IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2624CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2624PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2624SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/ham/SB2624_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0380018.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0640021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0840028.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0840015.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback