MS SB2557 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Advocate Confidentiality Law; To Provide That Communications Of Victims Of Domestic Violence, Sexual Assault, Stalking And Human Trafficking With Advocates Are Confidential; To Establish Procedures For Disclosure In Limited Circumstances; To Provide For In-camera Review Before Disclosure; To Amend Section 93-21-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Advocate confidentiality law; protect certain information held by rape crisis and domestic violence programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Doty [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |