MS SB2552 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 67-3-22 And 67-3-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Prohibitions Against, And Penalties For, Brewpubs Selling Beer And Light Wine Away From Their Premises And Packaging Beer And Light Wine So That They May Be Carried Away From Their Premises; To Amend Section 27-71-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of Brewpub Accordingly; To Bring Forward Section 27-71-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Brewpubs and small craft breweries; remove certain limits and prohibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |