MS SB2532 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-33-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Employer Notification To Certain Parents Or Guardians Of Children Under The Age Of 18 Who Come In Contact With An Employee Who Is Required To Register As A Sex Offender; To Amend Section 45-33-32, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Requirements For Volunteers; To Amend Section 45-33-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Definition Under The Sex Offender Registration Act In Order To Require Homeless Or Transient Residents To Provide A Specific Description Of Where That Offender Habitually Lives; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sex offenders; employers must notify parent or guardian of certain minors who come in contact with registered employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Cockerham, Bailey) |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |