MS SB2465 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 85-7-405, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete Language Clarifying The Date The Claim Was Due On The Claim Form Provided In The Code; To Provide That A Lis Pendens Notice Shall Be Filed Within A Certain Number Of Days After The Date Of The Commencement Of The Action; To Provide That The Failure To File The Lis Pendens Notice Within A Set Timeframe Shall Invalidate The Claim Of Lien; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Construction liens; failure to file notice within certain period of time shall invalidate claim of lien.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |