MS SB2448 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 57-64-3, 57-64-7, 57-64-11 And 57-64-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Definitions To Include Political Subdivisions In Addition To Counties And Municipalities In The Local Government Units Authorized To Participate In Regional Economic Development Alliances Under The Regional Economic Development Act; To Authorize Local Government Units To Issue Bonds Or Incur Debt Under The Regional Economic Development Act If They Are Otherwise Authorized By Law To Issue Bonds Or Incur Debt; To Authorize Any Local Government Unit That Is A Member Of A Regional Economic Development Alliance To Negotiate Purchase Options For Real Property To Be Used For The Purposed Of The Alliance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Regional economic development alliance; allow all political subdivisions to participate in.
Sponsors
Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] |
Sen. Albert Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-02 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed |
2017-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |