MS SB2443 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Teacher Salary Scale By Increasing The Minimum Salary For The 2022-2023 School Year; To Set The Minimum Teacher Salary For The 2023-2024 School Year And Subsequent School Years; To Delete The Cap On The Number Of National Board-certified Nurses And Speech-language Pathologists And Audiologists Employed By Schools Districts Who Are Allowed To Receive The Salary Supplement For National Board Certification; To Require The Payment Of An Annual Salary Supplement To State-licensed Athletic Trainers Employed By A School District Who Have Acquired National Board Certification; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nationally certified school employees; delete caps on nurses & speech pathologists, add athletic trainers for salary supplements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |