MS SB2423 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That It Shall Be The Duty Of The Commission On Teacher And Administrator Education, Certification And Licensure And Development To Establish Standards, Subject To The Approval Of The State Board Of Education, For Teacher Supplemental Endorsements, Provided That The Standards Allow Teachers As Many Options As Possible To Receive A Supplemental Endorsement, Including, But Not Limited To, The Option Of Taking Additional Coursework Or Earning At Least The Minimum Qualifying Score Or Higher On The Required Licensure Subject Assessment Relevant To The Endorsement Area For Which The Licensure Is Sought, Provided That The Subject Assessment Option Shall Not Apply To Certain Subject Areas, Including, But Not Limited To, Early/primary Education Prek-3, Elementary Education, Or Special Education Except By Special Approval By The State Board Of Education; To Require The Department Of Education To Grant And Renew All Licenses And Certifications Of Teachers And Administrators Within 21 Days Of A Completed Application; To Provide That Teachers Who Possess A Teacher License From Another Country Or Political Subdivision Thereof Shall Be Granted A Standard Five-year License By The Department Of Education; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Teacher license; allow supplemental endorsement and revise provisions of issuance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,McCarty,Felsher |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named DeBar,Blount,Polk |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | House | Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred To Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Education |