MS SB2422 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-7-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Procurement Card For Classroom Supplies Using Educational Enhancement Funds Shall Be Issued To Teachers On August 1 Of Each Year; To Provide That Local School Boards Shall Require Each School To Issue Credentials For A Digital Solution Selected Or Procurement Cards For The Use Of Teachers In Making Instructional Supply Fund Expenditures Under The Educational Enhancement Fund; To Amend Section 37-61-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Distribute Education Enhancement Funds For Classroom Supplies To Eligible Teachers Through The Use Of Digital Solutions And Their Applicable Credentials; To Set Timelines For The Issuance Of These Solutions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Education Enhancement Fund; revise date of issuance and distribution of procurement cards or digital solutions for classroom supplies.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] | Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,McCarty,Owen |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named DeBar,Blount,Boyd |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | House | Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred To Education |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amended |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 7 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 61 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |