LA HCR40 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Judicial Security Task Force
Title
Creates the Judicial Security Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - House Vote on HCR 40 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1170) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 40 CONCUR (#625) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 40 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#558) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 40 CONCUR (#625) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 40 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#558) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-20 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/21/2024. |
2024-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |