MS SB2420 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A Public Registry Of Offenders Whose Crimes Involved The Embezzlement Or Misappropriation Of Public Funds; To Define Terms; To Direct The Department Of Public Safety To Create A Registry Of Offenders; To Require Responsible Agencies To Forward Certain Information To The Department; To Require Offenders To Report To The Department Within A Prescribed Timeframe; To Authorize The Department To Promulgate Rules For The Implementation Of The Act; To Amend Section 25-1-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Local Governments From Hiring Persons On The Registry For Certain Positions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public Funds Offender Registry; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed |
2023-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Tabled Subject To Call |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |