MS SB2362 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Entitled The "mississippi Budget Transparency And Simplification Act Of 2016"; To Provide That From And After July 1, 2016, No State Agency Shall Charge Another State Agency A Fee, Assessment, Rent Or Other Charge For Services Or Resources Received; To Provide That Beginning July 1, 2016, The Expenses Of Certain State Special Fund Agencies Shall Be Defrayed By Appropriation Of The Legislature From The State General Fund, To Provide That Any Fees, Assessments Or Other Charges For The Support Of Said Agencies Shall Be Deposited Into The State General Fund, To Abolish Any Special Funds Created In The State Treasury For The Support Of Said Agencies, And To Provide Certain Limitations On Amounts Appropriated By The Legislature For The Support Of Said Agencies; To Amend Sections 75-76-325, 75-76-33, 75-76-81, 75-76-85, 45-11-3, 45-11-5, 45-11-7, 25-53-5, 7-7-3, 25-53-29, 25-53-151, 25-53-171, 31-7-10, 63-9-31, 83-1-27, 83-2-33, 83-2-35, 83-5-17, 83-5-41, 83-5-45, 83-5-69, 83-5-72, 83-5-73, 83-5-77, 83-9-3, 83-17-71, 83-17-519, 83-19-21, 83-21-1, 83-37-29, 83-39-3, 83-73-9, 45-6-15, 53-1-77, 53-11-23, 53-1-7, 53-1-73, 53-3-13, 25-9-141, 7-9-22, 7-3-59, 23-15-5, 23-15-169.7, 29-1-95, 77-3-87, 77-1-6, 77-1-15, 77-1-29, 77-1-53, 77-3-8, 77-3-89, 77-3-503, 77-3-507, 77-3-509, 77-7-127, 77-7-333, 77-7-339, 77-7-337, 77-9-489, 77-11-201, 99-18-1, 27-19-179, 11-46-17, 71-3-100, 7-5-61, 25-9-119 And 27-104-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That All Traffic And Criminal Assessments Shall Be Deposited Into The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Transparency and Simplification Act; all special fund agencies funded through General Fund, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-15 - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-06 Approved by Governor
2016-04-18HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-18SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-15SenateConference Report Adopted
2016-04-15HouseConference Report Adopted
2016-04-13HouseConference Report Filed
2016-04-13SenateConference Report Filed
2016-04-13HouseConferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Read
2016-04-11SenateConferees Named Clarke,Hopson,DeBar
2016-04-05SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2016-03-31HouseReturned For Concurrence
2016-03-31HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2016-03-29HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
2016-03-29HousePassed As Amended
2016-03-29HouseAmended
2016-03-25HouseRead the Third Time
2016-03-22HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2016-03-08HouseReferred To Appropriations
2016-03-04SenateTransmitted To House
2016-03-02SenatePassed As Amended
2016-03-02SenateAmended
2016-02-18SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2016-02-08SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback