MS SB2351 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-7-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Public School Districts From Paying Membership Dues To The Mississippi High School Activities Association (mhsaa) Or Any Other Statewide Extracurricular Sponsoring Organization Unless Such Organization Complies With The Mississippi Open Meetings Law; To Prohibit Public School Districts From Paying Membership Dues To The Mississippi High School Activities Association (mhsaa) Or Any Other Statewide Extracurricular Sponsoring Organization That Allows Biological Males To Compete Against Biological Females In Sports, As Defined By Dna; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi High School Activities Association; require to comply with Mississippi Open Meetings Law to receive public funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Education |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Point of Order-Not Well Taken |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Point of Order Raised |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Education |