MS SB2341 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-11-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Child Support For A Child With A Disability May Continue Past The Age Of Majority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child support; create presumption that support continues past the age of majority for a disabled child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2022-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-29 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Reynolds,Aguirre |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Parker,England |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |