MS SB2279 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-9-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Criminalize Absconding From Parole Or Probation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Parole and earned release; criminalize absconding.
Sponsors
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Joel Carter [R] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Sen. Chad Mcmahan [R] | Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. Bart Williams [R] | Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 101 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Horan,Bomgar |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Wiggins,McCaughn |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-03-01 | House | DR - TSDPAA: CN To JB |
2021-02-25 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JB To CN |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Judiciary B;Corrections |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |