MS SB2209 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Portion Of Old Highway 15/south Jackson Street In Houston, Mississippi, As The "mississippi Supreme Court Chief Justice Armis Hawkins Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highway; designate portion of Old Highway 15/South Jackson Street in Houston for Armis Hawkins.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2020-06-04 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |