MS SB2078 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Crimes Of Public Intimidation And Public Retaliation Against A Law Enforcement Officer; To Enact Punishment Therefor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Law enforcement officer; create crime of public intimidation of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-06 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |