MS SB2073 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 93-19-13, 1-3-27, 15-3-11, 11-5-115, 89-1-301, 93-19-1, 93-19-9, 91-20-3, 91-20-41 And 15-1-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Lower The Age Of Majority To 18 For Securing Loans And Entering Contracts For Real Property; To Repeal Section 93-3-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The Provision Of Law That Removes The Disability Of Minority For Certain Married Persons Solely With Respect To Homestead Transactions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Age of majority; lower to 18 for securing loans and entering contracts for real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Reynolds,Felsher |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,McCaughn,Hill |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-06 | House | Amended |
2023-03-06 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2023-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 3 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 5 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 1 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
89 | 1 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
91 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
91 | 20 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 19 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 19 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 19 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 3 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |